Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Magellano

Deceased

Bishop of San Leone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
15 May 156565.3AppointedBishop of San Leone, Italy
7 Oct 156565.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Leone, Italy
27 Nov 157171.9DiedBishop of San Leone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Magellano
Bishop Alvaro Magellano (born 1500, died ) Bishop of San Leone

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018