Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Maddalena, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1677³BornNapoli
17 Sep 170023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular Minor
2 Mar 172244.4AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
8 Mar 172244.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
17 Jun 172446.7SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
27 Sep 172447.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
11 Jul 174365.8DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Maddalena:
Archbishop Andrea Maddalena C.R.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015