Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephanus Ladislaus Luzénszky

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1686³BornLaudek
1715¹28.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 172942.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
12 Mar 173043.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
6 Feb 173346.2SelectedBishop of Varaždin, Croatia
18 Jan 173447.1DiedTitular Bishop of Thyatira

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Ladislaus Luzénszky:
Bishop Stephanus Ladislaus Luzénszky (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thyatira

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 432
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015