Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Lumley, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Jos, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1898Born
23 May 192628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
22 Jun 193436.2AppointedPrefect of Jos, Nigeria
195354.8ResignedPrefect of Jos, Nigeria
22 Sep 196264.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Jos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for William Lumley
Father William Lumley S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Jos

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaddington, Ireland

  • a priest for 36.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018