Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eudes de Lorry

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 May 1263AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
29 Jul 1263Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
8 Aug 1274DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Eudes de Lorry
Bishop Eudes de Lorry (died ) Bishop of Bayeux

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 124
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,722

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jun 2020

Quantcast