Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere

Deceased

Priest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1762Born
8 Mar 181653.2Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181653.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
14 Jul 181855.6DiedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere
Alessandro Cardinal Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere (born , died ) Priest of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 2.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast