Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Hugh of Avalon, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1135BornCastle of Avalon, France
116025.0ProfessedMember of Carthusian Order
116530.0Ordained PriestPriest of Carthusian Order
10 Aug 118651.6AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 118651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 120065.8DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
1220Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Hugh of Avalon:
Bishop St. Hugh of Avalon O. Cart. (born 1135, died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 9
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015