Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Leyburn

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1503AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
17 Sep 1503Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
17 Jul 1507DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger Leyburn
Bishop Roger Leyburn (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlisle, Diocese of Carlisle, England

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 170
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 153
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast