Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerhard (Thomas) Lennartz, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Adamaua, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1879Born
25 Sep 190122.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
1906²26.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
29 Apr 191435.0AppointedPrefect of Adamaua, Cameroon
30 Dec 191940.6ResignedPrefect of Adamaua, Cameroon
31 Mar 193959.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Adamaua, Cameroon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerhard (Thomas) Lennartz
Father Gerhard (Thomas) Lennartz S.C.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Adamaua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRheydt, Germany
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018