Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amaury Cardinal de Lautrec, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Administrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

Administrator of Rieux

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Aug 1370AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
15 Apr 1381AppointedAdministrator of Rieux, France
18 May 1384AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
12 Jul 1385AppointedAdministrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
12 Jul 1385Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jul 1385AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
7 Jun 1390DiedAdministrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France

MicroData Summary for Amaury de Lautrec
Amaury Cardinal de Lautrec C.R.S.A. (died ) Administrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Albi
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Avignon

  • a cardinal for 4.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 203, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast