Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oliver King

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1432Born
1 Oct 149260.8AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
3 Feb 149361.1Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 149563.8AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
29 Aug 150371.7DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Oliver King:
Bishop Oliver King (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 142, and Page 376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 103, and Page 152
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013