Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rembert von Kerssenbrock

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474¹Born
26 Mar 154773.2SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
1 Jul 154773.5ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
22 May 154874.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
12 Feb 156894.1DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rembert von Kerssenbrock (VIAF: 81524790)
Bishop Rembert von Kerssenbrock (born 1474, died ) Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruch
Ordained BishopDalheim
Death PlaceDringenberg

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018