Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus de Kentzingen

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1288¹Born
13 Apr 133446.2AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
14 Apr 133446.2Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
25 Jul 134456.5DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus de Kentzingen (VIAF: 88290636)
Bishop Nikolaus de Kentzingen (born 1288, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 204
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Feb 2016