Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James Mary Héctor Nicholas Joubert de la Muraille, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic

Titular Bishop of Elusa

Titular See: (vica/Haiti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1777BornSaint Jean d’Angely, France
1810¹32.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
27 Jul 184163.8AppointedVicar Apostolic
27 Jul 184163.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
5 Nov 184366.1DiedVicar Apostolic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Mary Héctor Nicholas Joubert de la Muraille (VIAF: 6946187)
Father James Mary Héctor Nicholas Joubert de la Muraille P.S.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic

  • a priest for 33.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016