Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jordan

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1327AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
31 Aug 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Nov 1328DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jordan
Bishop Jordan (died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 515
  • b/c2: ATh, 4 Oct 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,876

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast