Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignatius Petrus Jarweh (Jaroue)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1777²BornAlep
1810²33.0AppointedBishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
14 Sep 181033.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
25 Feb 182043.1SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
25 Feb 182043.1SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
28 Jan 182851.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
28 Jan 182851.1ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
16 Oct 185174.8DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Petrus Jarweh (Jaroue):
Patriarch Ignatius Petrus Jarweh (Jaroue) (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 80
  • b: CB, 1 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013