Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro India

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1766Born
18 Dec 179024.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 183669.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
1837¹70.1DiedTitular Bishop of Myrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro India
Bishop Pietro India (born , died 1837) Titular Bishop of Myrina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Italy

  • a priest for 46.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018