Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert von Hoya

Deceased

Bishop of Minden, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1420²SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Minden, Germany
23 Dec 1436SucceededBishop of Minden, Germany
18 Feb 1437ConfirmedBishop of Minden, Germany
5 Apr 1437Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 1437Ordained BishopBishop of Minden, Germany
25 Apr 1473DiedBishop of Minden, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albert von Hoya
Bishop Albert von Hoya (died ) Bishop of Minden

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,603
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jun 2019

Quantcast