Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Hopton, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1554SelectedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 1555ConfirmedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
24 Aug 1558DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Hopton
Bishop John Hopton O.P. (died ) Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBishops, Chapel, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 468
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018