Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Baines

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1504Born
151915.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 155450.8SelectedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
18 Nov 155450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 155551.4ConfirmedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 155955.4ResignedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
18 Nov 155955.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Baines (VIAF: 29571596)
Bishop Ralph Baines (born 1504, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coventry and Lichfield

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKnowsthorpe, Yorkshire

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 556
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018