Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rodolfo de Hoheneck

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Dec 1284AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
10 Mar 1285Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 1285Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
3 Aug 1290DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo de Hoheneck
Archbishop Rodolfo de Hoheneck (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 5.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 432
  • b/c2: CB, 2 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 6 Jan 2021

Quantcast