Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rupert (Gilbert Paul) Hillerich, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Prefect of Solwezi, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1913Born
1936²22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Aug 195946.3AppointedPrefect of Solwezi, Zambia
26 May 196956.0DiedPrefect of Solwezi, Zambia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rupert (Gilbert Paul) Hillerich
Father Rupert (Gilbert Paul) Hillerich O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Prefect of Solwezi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouisville, KY, Diocese of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
Death PlaceNdola, Hospital, Diocese of Ndola
Buried Place (Original)St. Francis College, Kitwe

  • a priest for 33.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast