Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal Hergenröther

Deceased

Prefect of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1824BornWürzburg, Germany
28 Mar 184823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
12 May 187954.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 187954.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
9 Jun 187954.7AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archives
1 Jun 188863.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
3 Oct 189066.1DiedPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hergenröther:
Cardinal Joseph Hergenröther (born , died ) Prefect of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013