Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henri Henrard, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1736Born
17 Oct 180872.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Liège, Belgium
23 Sep 181478.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Liège, Belgium
29 Sep 181478.3DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Henri Henrard
Father Henri Henrard O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOleye

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast