Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro Celestí (Jaume) Gusi i Rossell, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Sublacense)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1897Born
15 Aug 191517.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jan 191921.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Mar 192123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Sep 195961.8AppointedSuperior General of Order of Saint Benedict
Oct 1966³68.9ResignedSuperior General of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jun 197880.6DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Celestí (Jaume) Gusi i Rossell
Father Pedro Celestí (Jaume) Gusi i Rossell O.S.B. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Death PlaceMontserrat, Abbey

  • a priest for 57.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast