Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Guerrero Logroño (Mendoza)

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501²Born
28 Oct 154645.8AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
27 Feb 154746.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Granada, Spain
2 Apr 157675.2DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Guerrero Logroño (Mendoza)
Archbishop Pedro Guerrero Logroño (Mendoza) (born 1501, died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeza, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopSigüenza, Diocese of Sigüenza
Death PlaceGranada, Archdiocese of Granada

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 205
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,215
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 59, Number 329
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018