Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Fernando Niño de Guevara

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Apostolic Administrator of Sigüenza


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1539AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
5 Oct 1539Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
22 Mar 1542AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
8 Oct 1546AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
8 Oct 1546AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sigüenza, Spain
16 Sep 1552DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Niño de Guevara (VIAF: 32797053)
Patriarch Fernando Niño de Guevara (died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 50, Number 269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast