Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis II Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1555Born
26 Dec 157419.4AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
21 Feb 157822.6Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 157923.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 158024.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reims, France
24 Dec 158833.4DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary
Louis II de Guise de Lorraine
Louis II Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine
(born , died )
Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDampierre
Ordained BishopSaint-Clément chapel, Saint-Denis, Abbey
Death PlaceRoyal, Château, Blois

Relatives
  • a priest for 9.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,824
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 5
  • b/c12: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 4
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,769
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025