Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de LaGuinonie (Guido), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lodève, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1323AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
18 Dec 1323Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
20 Jul 1324AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
30 Dec 1331DiedBishop of Lodève, France

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de LaGuinonie (Guido)
Bishop Bernardo de LaGuinonie (Guido) O.P. (died ) Bishop of Lodève

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 501, and Page 310
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 302, Number 145
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast