Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Valeriano Guemes Rodriguez, C.M. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Cuttack, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1890Born
1908²17.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
29 Aug 191524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
2 Jul 192938.7AppointedSuperior of Cuttack, India
193241.2ResignedSuperior of Cuttack, India
12 Dec 197888.1DiedSuperior Emeritus of Cuttack, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Guemes Rodriguez
Father Valeriano Guemes Rodriguez C.M. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Cuttack

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuintanarruz, Spain

  • a priest for 63.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018