Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Guidobono Cavalchini

Deceased

Priest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular See: (SC of Good Government)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1755Born
24 Aug 180751.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 Apr 181862.3Elevated to Cardinal
6 Apr 181862.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
Feb 182468.1AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
5 Dec 182873.0DiedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Guidobono Cavalchini
Francesco Cardinal Guidobono Cavalchini (born , died ) Priest of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTortona, Diocese of Tortona

  • a cardinal for 21.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast