Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Grossi

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1545AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
22 Jan 1549SucceededBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
28 Mar 1569DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Grossi
Bishop Giambattista Grossi (died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018