Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Heinrich Suso (Lorenz) Groner, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1895Born
24 Sep 191620.7ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
21 Mar 192024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
20 Sep 194953.7SelectedCoadjutor Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
22 Sep 194953.7SucceededAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
1 Oct 194953.7ConfirmedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
7 Aug 196872.6DiedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Suso (Lorenz) Groner
Abbot Heinrich Suso (Lorenz) Groner O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTomerdingen

  • a priest for 48.3 years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017