Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wawrzyniec Goślicki

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538¹Born
7 Jan 158749.0AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
12 Jul 158749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
22 Jan 159052.0AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
10 May 159153.3AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
19 Mar 160163.2AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
31 Oct 160769.8DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wawrzyniec Goślicki (VIAF: 5720882)
Bishop Wawrzyniec Goślicki (born 1538, died ) Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWarszawa

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 280
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,926
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast