Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Maria González Rúbio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Former Administrator of Monterey, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1804Born
10 Jan 182520.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
184641.5AppointedAdministrator of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México
184944.5ResignedAdministrator of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México
2 Nov 187571.4DiedFormer Administrator of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México

MicroData Summary for José Maria González Rúbio (VIAF: 48478983)
Father José Maria González Rúbio O.F.M. (born , died ) Former Administrator of Monterey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast