Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Gregory Gomez, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of New Norcia, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1904Born
18 Aug 192824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jul 195147.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Drisdale River, Australia
7 Jul 195147.1AppointedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
197166.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Drisdale River, Australia
18 Dec 197369.6ResignedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
31 May 199591.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of New Norcia, Australia

MicroData Summary for Gregory Gomez
Abbot Gregory Gomez O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of New Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilloruebo, Spain

  • a priest for 66.7 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018