Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543Born
30 Aug 158946.6AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
1 Oct 158946.7Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
7 May 159249.3DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Gonzaga
Bishop Marcantonio Gonzaga (born 1543, died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopVerona, Diocese of Verona
Death PlaceCasale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Buried Place (Original)Longini Chapel, S. Andrea, Church, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 16*
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 27 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast