Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Giustiniani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502¹Born
27 Jun 155048.4AppointedBishop of Ario, Greece
5 Oct 155149.7AppointedBishop of Rethymo, Greece
14 Apr 156462.2AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
5 Apr 156866.2AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
1571²69.0DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Giustiniani
Bishop Timoteo Giustiniani O.P. (born 1502, died 1571) Bishop of Strongoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118, and Page 165
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 146, and Page 305
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,550, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast