Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ignace (Jacques) Gillet, O.C.S.O. †

Deceased

Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1901Born
2 Jul 192625.1ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
24 Aug 192928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
16 Jan 196462.6AppointedAbbot General of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
6 May 197472.9ResignedAbbot General of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
4 Dec 199796.5DiedAbbot General Emeritus of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance

MicroData Summary for Ignace (Jacques) Gillet
Father Ignace (Jacques) Gillet O.C.S.O. (born , died ) Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Quentin

  • a priest for 68.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast