Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Geiger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornHainburg
1628¹7.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 165837.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
6 May 165837.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
4 Aug 165837.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
2 Jul 166948.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Geiger:
Bishop Martin Geiger (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214, and Page 379
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015