Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Garcia Mendes, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornAlter de Chao
12 Jun 159818.4ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
23 Jun 163656.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
23 Jun 163656.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
1 Nov 163757.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
2 Dec 164161.9SucceededArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
3 Sep 165979.6DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Garcia Mendes:
Archbishop Francisco Garcia Mendes S.J. (died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167, and Page 96
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1637, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Mar 2015