Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco dos Martyres, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1583Born
3 Dec 163552.3AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
9 Mar 163652.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
25 Nov 165269.3DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Francisco dos Martyres
Archbishop Francisco dos Martyres O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceGoa, Archdiocese of Goa

  • a bishop for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 2
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast