Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Garimberti, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
163116.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Dec 167560.9AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
20 Dec 167560.9Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
16 Feb 167661.1InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
20 Mar 168469.2DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Garimberti
Bishop Gaetano Garimberti C.R. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma

  • a bishop for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018