Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás García Jerez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1757BornMurcia, Spain
17 Nov 180649.8AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
1 Apr 181053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
31 Jul 182568.5DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Nicolás García Jerez:
Bishop Nicolás García Jerez O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 15.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,102
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013