Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Gandolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1463AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
27 Nov 1463Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
4 Jul 1471DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Gandolfi:
Bishop Bartolomeo Gandolfi (died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 152
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,340
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,926

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013