Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ignacio García Martin, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of San Francisco Javier, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1901Born
9 Aug 193433.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Jul 194645.0AppointedPrefect of San Francisco Javier, Peru
1958²56.4ResignedPrefect of San Francisco Javier, Peru
13 Jun 196563.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of San Francisco Javier, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio García Martin
Father Ignacio García Martin S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of San Francisco Javier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a priest for 30.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast