Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Georg Froewis, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Sinyangchow, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1865Born
189226.9ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
3 Dec 189328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
1 Aug 192863.5AppointedPrefect of Sinyangchow, China
25 Apr 193368.2ResignedPrefect of Sinyangchow, China
11 Nov 193469.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Sinyangchow, China

MicroData Summary for Georg Froewis
Father Georg Froewis S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Sinyangchow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlberschwende, Italy

  • a priest for 40.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018