Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Förner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornWeismain
1594²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
3 Sep 161242.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
3 Sep 161242.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
7 Oct 161242.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
5 Dec 163060.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Förner:
Bishop Friedrich Förner (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015