Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Gottfried von Aschhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1575BornLauda
22 Dec 160126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
21 Jul 160933.9SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
4 Nov 160934.2ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
2 Feb 161034.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
5 Oct 161742.1SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
10 Feb 161842.5ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
29 Dec 162247.4DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Gottfried von Aschhausen:
Bishop Johann Gottfried von Aschhausen (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 21.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014