Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Theodore Foley, C.P. †

Deceased

Superior General of Congregation of the Passion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1913Born
15 Aug 193320.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
23 Apr 194027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
7 May 196451.1AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Passion
9 Oct 197461.5DiedSuperior General of Congregation of the Passion

MicroData Summary for Theodore Foley
Father Theodore Foley C.P. (born , died ) Superior General of Congregation of the Passion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpingfield, MA, USA

  • a priest for 34.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018